THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:09:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-9 Eric Devlin Lane
Perth ON K7H 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-201-9300
Fax: 613-201-9301
Address: PSFDH
33 Drummond St W
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
Phone: 613-267-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gutcher Last Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Last (CPSO#: 97938 ) Dr. S. Gutcher (CPSO#: 95823 )
Business Address: 39 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2J9
(613) 264-2686
Business Address: Perth and Smith Falls
District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
(613) 267-1500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-9 Eric Devlin Lane
Perth ON K7H 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-201-9300
Fax: 613-201-9301
Address: PSFDH
33 Drummond St W
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
Phone: 613-267-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gutcher Last Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Last (CPSO#: 97938 ) Dr. S. Gutcher (CPSO#: 95823 )
Business Address: 39 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2J9
(613) 264-2686
Business Address: Perth and Smith Falls
District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
(613) 267-1500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE JENNIFER LAST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE JENNIFER LAST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012