THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 14:45:26 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5025 Yonge St
Suite 201
Toronto Ontario M2N 5P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-846-3777
Fax: 647-846-3779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balasuriya & Gunawardena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gunawardena (CPSO#: 99566 ) Dr. R. Balasuriya (CPSO#: 96604 )
Business Address: 201 - 5025 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 5P2
(647) 846-3777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5025 Yonge St
Suite 201
Toronto Ontario M2N 5P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-846-3777
Fax: 647-846-3779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balasuriya & Gunawardena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gunawardena (CPSO#: 99566 ) Dr. R. Balasuriya (CPSO#: 96604 )
Business Address: 201 - 5025 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 5P2
(647) 846-3777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJIV DHANANJAYA BALASURIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALASURIYA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJIV DHANANJAYA BALASURIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALASURIYA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 08 Feb 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2011