THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:45:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5025 Yonge St
Suite 201
Toronto Ontario M2P 2S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-846-3777
Fax: 647-846-3779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Feb 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 27 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balasuriya & Gunawardena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gunawardena (CPSO#: 99566 ) Dr. R. Balasuriya (CPSO#: 96604 )
Business Address: 201 - 5025 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 5P2
(647) 846-3777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5025 Yonge St
Suite 201
Toronto Ontario M2P 2S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-846-3777
Fax: 647-846-3779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Feb 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 27 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balasuriya & Gunawardena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gunawardena (CPSO#: 99566 ) Dr. R. Balasuriya (CPSO#: 96604 )
Business Address: 201 - 5025 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 5P2
(647) 846-3777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DISHANI THILAKSHINI GUNAWARDENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNAWARDENA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DISHANI THILAKSHINI GUNAWARDENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNAWARDENA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2012