THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:21:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Specialized Geriatric Services
Elder Care Centre
Unit 300
243 Consumer's Road
North York Ontario M2J 4W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6871
Fax: 416-756-6438

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nihal Haque and Dr. Abeyat Zaman-Haque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaman-Haque (CPSO#: 98500 ) Dr. N. Haque (CPSO#: 98064 )
Business Address: 300-243 Consumers Rd
North York ON M2J 4W8
416-756-6871
Business Address: Senior's Health Centre Clinic
2 Buchan Court
North York Ontario M2J 5A3
(416) 756-6050 Extn: 8093
Business Address: 840 Coxwell Ave
Suite 219
East York ON M4C 5T2
416-696-0003

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Specialized Geriatric Services
Elder Care Centre
Unit 300
243 Consumer's Road
North York Ontario M2J 4W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6871
Fax: 416-756-6438

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nihal Haque and Dr. Abeyat Zaman-Haque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaman-Haque (CPSO#: 98500 ) Dr. N. Haque (CPSO#: 98064 )
Business Address: 300-243 Consumers Rd
North York ON M2J 4W8
416-756-6871
Business Address: Senior's Health Centre Clinic
2 Buchan Court
North York Ontario M2J 5A3
(416) 756-6050 Extn: 8093
Business Address: 840 Coxwell Ave
Suite 219
East York ON M4C 5T2
416-696-0003

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIHAL HAQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIHAL HAQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012