THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:47:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: Zaman, Abeyat (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Zaman, Abeyat (Used Until: 24 Sep 2012)
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 219
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 696-0003
Fax: (416) 696-0022

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 25 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nihal Haque and Dr. Abeyat Zaman-Haque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaman-Haque (CPSO#: 98500 ) Dr. N. Haque (CPSO#: 98064 )
Business Address: 300-243 Consumers Rd
North York ON M2J 4W8
416-756-6871
Business Address: Senior's Health Centre Clinic
2 Buchan Court
North York Ontario M2J 5A3
(416) 756-6050 Extn: 8093
Business Address: 840 Coxwell Ave
Suite 219
East York ON M4C 5T2
416-696-0003

General Information

Former Name: Zaman, Abeyat (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Zaman, Abeyat (Used Until: 24 Sep 2012)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 219
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 696-0003
Fax: (416) 696-0022

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 25 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nihal Haque and Dr. Abeyat Zaman-Haque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaman-Haque (CPSO#: 98500 ) Dr. N. Haque (CPSO#: 98064 )
Business Address: 300-243 Consumers Rd
North York ON M2J 4W8
416-756-6871
Business Address: Senior's Health Centre Clinic
2 Buchan Court
North York Ontario M2J 5A3
(416) 756-6050 Extn: 8093
Business Address: 840 Coxwell Ave
Suite 219
East York ON M4C 5T2
416-696-0003

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABEYAT ZAMAN-HAQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMAN-HAQUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABEYAT ZAMAN-HAQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMAN-HAQUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012