THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 12:18:27 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A4V2
Phone: 519-646-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A5A5
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bluewater Health
Emergency Department
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: 519-464-4400
Extension: 5214
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fuller Goela Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Goela (CPSO#: 98140 ) Dr. E. Fuller (CPSO#: 98187 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: Bluewater Health
Emergency Department
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A4V2
Phone: 519-646-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A5A5
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bluewater Health
Emergency Department
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: 519-464-4400
Extension: 5214
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fuller Goela Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Goela (CPSO#: 98140 ) Dr. E. Fuller (CPSO#: 98187 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: Bluewater Health
Emergency Department
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAPIL GOELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOELA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAPIL GOELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOELA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012