THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:32:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Lambton CHC
3-59 King Street West
Forest Ontario N0N1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)786-4545
Fax: (519)786-6318
Address: Kettle Point CHC
6275 Indian Lane
Forest Ontario N0N1J1
Phone: (519)786-2700
Fax: (519)786-4992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fuller Goela Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Goela (CPSO#: 98140 ) Dr. E. Fuller (CPSO#: 98187 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: Bluewater Health
Emergency Department
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Lambton CHC
3-59 King Street West
Forest Ontario N0N1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)786-4545
Fax: (519)786-6318
Address: Kettle Point CHC
6275 Indian Lane
Forest Ontario N0N1J1
Phone: (519)786-2700
Fax: (519)786-4992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fuller Goela Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Goela (CPSO#: 98140 ) Dr. E. Fuller (CPSO#: 98187 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: Bluewater Health
Emergency Department
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELISA CHRISTINA FULLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FULLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELISA CHRISTINA FULLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FULLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012