THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:42:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139697400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SELF BERGER-RICHARDSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Berger-Richardson (CPSO#: 98725 ) Dr. L. Self (CPSO#: 98299 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139697400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SELF BERGER-RICHARDSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Berger-Richardson (CPSO#: 98725 ) Dr. L. Self (CPSO#: 98299 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN SELF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN SELF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012