THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:51:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 243 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-968-9934
Fax: 613-968-9935

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 31 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SELF BERGER-RICHARDSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Berger-Richardson (CPSO#: 98725 ) Dr. L. Self (CPSO#: 98299 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 243 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-968-9934
Fax: 613-968-9935

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 31 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SELF BERGER-RICHARDSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Berger-Richardson (CPSO#: 98725 ) Dr. L. Self (CPSO#: 98299 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID BERGER-RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGER-RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID BERGER-RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGER-RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012