THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 14:21:00 PM

General Information

Former Name: Chacon, Maria del Pilar (Used Until: 20 Dec 2017)
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Bucaramanga, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Centre
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. AND E. WATTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Watts (CPSO#: 98561 ) Dr. E. Watts (CPSO#: 99133 )

Corporation Name: DR. M. Watts MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Feb 2024

General Information

Former Name: Chacon, Maria del Pilar (Used Until: 20 Dec 2017)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Bucaramanga, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Centre
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. AND E. WATTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Watts (CPSO#: 98561 ) Dr. E. Watts (CPSO#: 99133 )

Corporation Name: DR. M. Watts MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Feb 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA DEL PILAR WATTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATTS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA DEL PILAR WATTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATTS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Bucaramanga, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012