THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:02:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Warwick, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-3374
Fax: (905) 472-3116

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. AND E. WATTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Watts (CPSO#: 98561 ) Dr. E. Watts (CPSO#: 99133 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Warwick, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-3374
Fax: (905) 472-3116

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. AND E. WATTS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Watts (CPSO#: 98561 ) Dr. E. Watts (CPSO#: 99133 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVAN WATTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATTS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVAN WATTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATTS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Warwick, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2012