THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:55:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Government Medical College, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1723 Kipling Avenue
Unit 2G
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 2Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6477488011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Fandor Medical Centre
15 Fandor Way, Unit 2A
Brampton Ontario L7A 4S2
Phone: (905) 970-1222
Fax: (905) 970-9666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jul 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 04 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janmeet and Guninder Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sandhu (CPSO#: 99127 ) Dr. J. Sandhu (CPSO#: 99128 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Government Medical College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1723 Kipling Avenue
Unit 2G
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 2Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6477488011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Fandor Medical Centre
15 Fandor Way, Unit 2A
Brampton Ontario L7A 4S2
Phone: (905) 970-1222
Fax: (905) 970-9666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jul 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 04 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janmeet and Guninder Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sandhu (CPSO#: 99127 ) Dr. J. Sandhu (CPSO#: 99128 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Apr 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 09 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Guninder Bir Singh Sandhu may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Guninder Bir Singh Sandhu may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Government Medical College, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2012