THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:35:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sardar Patel Medical College, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 2Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 244-8404
Fax: (416) 244-0310
Address: Fandor Medical Centre
15 Fandor Way, Unit 2A
Brampton Ontario L7A 4S2
Phone: (905) 970-1222
Fax: (905) 970-9666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janmeet and Guninder Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sandhu (CPSO#: 99127 ) Dr. J. Sandhu (CPSO#: 99128 )

Corporation Name: Janmeet Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jan 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Sardar Patel Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 2Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 244-8404
Fax: (416) 244-0310
Address: Fandor Medical Centre
15 Fandor Way, Unit 2A
Brampton Ontario L7A 4S2
Phone: (905) 970-1222
Fax: (905) 970-9666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janmeet and Guninder Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sandhu (CPSO#: 99127 ) Dr. J. Sandhu (CPSO#: 99128 )

Corporation Name: Janmeet Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jan 2017

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 May 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 21 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Janmeet Sandhu may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Janmeet Sandhu may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sardar Patel Medical College, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 21 May 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 May 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2012