THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:09:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Suite 202
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 622-0933
Fax: (416) 391-6118

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kuhlmann Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 104347 ) Dr. J. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 26815 ) Dr. E. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 96895 )
Business Address: 666 Burnhamthorpe Rd
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON M9C 2Z4
416-240-6179

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 104347 )
Business Address: Trillium (Mississuaga)
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Deptarment of Medicine
Room RFE-3-805
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 978-8383
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
Department of Medicine
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7336
Business Address: Panel Physician Toronto
Suite 202
666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 2Z4
(416) 622-0933
Business Address: Trillium (Credit Valley)
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V4M8
705-324-6111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Suite 202
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 622-0933
Fax: (416) 391-6118

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kuhlmann Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 104347 ) Dr. J. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 26815 ) Dr. E. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 96895 )
Business Address: 666 Burnhamthorpe Rd
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON M9C 2Z4
416-240-6179

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 104347 )
Business Address: Trillium (Mississuaga)
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Deptarment of Medicine
Room RFE-3-805
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 978-8383
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
Department of Medicine
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7336
Business Address: Panel Physician Toronto
Suite 202
666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 2Z4
(416) 622-0933
Business Address: Trillium (Credit Valley)
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V4M8
705-324-6111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALLEN KUHLMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHLMANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALLEN KUHLMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHLMANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014