THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 15:46:07 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Suite 202
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 622-0933
Fax: 416 391 6119
Address: Credit Valley Hospital
4th Floor
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Fax: 905-813-4024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kuhlmann Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 104347 ) Dr. J. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 26815 ) Dr. E. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 96895 )
Business Address: 666 Burnhamthorpe Rd
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON M9C 2Z4
416-240-6179

Corporation Name: Dr. Emily Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 96895 )
Business Address: Suite 202
666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Toronto Ontario M9C 2Z4
(416) 622-0933
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-1100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Suite 202
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 622-0933
Fax: 416 391 6119
Address: Credit Valley Hospital
4th Floor
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Fax: 905-813-4024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kuhlmann Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 104347 ) Dr. J. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 26815 ) Dr. E. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 96895 )
Business Address: 666 Burnhamthorpe Rd
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON M9C 2Z4
416-240-6179

Corporation Name: Dr. Emily Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 96895 )
Business Address: Suite 202
666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Toronto Ontario M9C 2Z4
(416) 622-0933
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-1100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY THELMA KUHLMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHLMANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY THELMA KUHLMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHLMANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2011