THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 16:11:26 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Suite 202
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 622-0933
Fax: (416) 622-0409
Address: 2065 Finch Avenue West
Suite 309
North York Ontario M3N 1W8
Phone: 416 507 6442
Fax: 416 391 6112

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kuhlmann Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 104347 ) Dr. J. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 26815 ) Dr. E. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 96895 )
Business Address: 666 Burnhamthorpe Rd
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON M9C 2Z4
416-240-6179

Corporation Name: J. Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jun 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. John Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Sep 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Suite 202
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 622-0933
Fax: (416) 622-0409
Address: 2065 Finch Avenue West
Suite 309
North York Ontario M3N 1W8
Phone: 416 507 6442
Fax: 416 391 6112

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kuhlmann Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 104347 ) Dr. J. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 26815 ) Dr. E. Kuhlmann (CPSO#: 96895 )
Business Address: 666 Burnhamthorpe Rd
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON M9C 2Z4
416-240-6179

Corporation Name: J. Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jun 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. John Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Sep 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN CHRISTIAN KUHLMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHLMANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN CHRISTIAN KUHLMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHLMANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1974
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 1974

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1974

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1973