THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 16:54:19 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Suite 206
Toronto ON M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-289-0185
Fax: 416-289-0187

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry Bacher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bacher (CPSO#: 95078 ) Dr. J. Bacher (CPSO#: 93621 ) Dr. L. Bacher (CPSO#: 33345 ) Dr. C. Bacher (CPSO#: 106716 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Suite 206
Toronto ON M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-289-0185
Fax: 416-289-0187

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry Bacher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bacher (CPSO#: 95078 ) Dr. J. Bacher (CPSO#: 93621 ) Dr. L. Bacher (CPSO#: 33345 ) Dr. C. Bacher (CPSO#: 106716 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COREY ADAM BACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COREY ADAM BACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015