THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 18:50:30 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Davisville Family Practice
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 932-3172
Fax: (416) 440-0238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry Bacher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bacher (CPSO#: 95078 ) Dr. J. Bacher (CPSO#: 93621 ) Dr. L. Bacher (CPSO#: 33345 ) Dr. C. Bacher (CPSO#: 106716 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Davisville Family Practice
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 932-3172
Fax: (416) 440-0238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry Bacher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bacher (CPSO#: 95078 ) Dr. J. Bacher (CPSO#: 93621 ) Dr. L. Bacher (CPSO#: 33345 ) Dr. C. Bacher (CPSO#: 106716 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANICE KAREN BACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANICE KAREN BACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010