THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:18:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2nd-199 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON M5R 2J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 620-6861
Fax: (416) 620-9774
Address: 190 Norseman Street
Institute of Human Mechanics
Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M8Z 2R4
Phone: (416) 620-6861
Fax: (416) 620-9774

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Bacher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bacher (CPSO#: 95078 )
Business Address: 1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y9
(416) 291-7719
Business Address: 230 Browns Line
Etobicoke Ontario M8W 3T4
(416) 620-6861

Corporation Name: Larry Bacher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bacher (CPSO#: 95078 ) Dr. J. Bacher (CPSO#: 93621 ) Dr. L. Bacher (CPSO#: 33345 ) Dr. C. Bacher (CPSO#: 106716 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2nd-199 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON M5R 2J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 620-6861
Fax: (416) 620-9774
Address: 190 Norseman Street
Institute of Human Mechanics
Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M8Z 2R4
Phone: (416) 620-6861
Fax: (416) 620-9774

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Bacher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bacher (CPSO#: 95078 )
Business Address: 1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y9
(416) 291-7719
Business Address: 230 Browns Line
Etobicoke Ontario M8W 3T4
(416) 620-6861

Corporation Name: Larry Bacher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bacher (CPSO#: 95078 ) Dr. J. Bacher (CPSO#: 93621 ) Dr. L. Bacher (CPSO#: 33345 ) Dr. C. Bacher (CPSO#: 106716 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY CHARLES BACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY CHARLES BACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011