THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:36:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HealthPark Medical Clinic
140 Oxford Street East
Suite 300
London Ontario N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-850-3234
Fax: 519-850-3238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Apr 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Pantazis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pantazis (CPSO#: 110983 )
Business Address: 140 Oxford Street East
Suite 300
London Ontario N6A 5R9
(519) 850-3234

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HealthPark Medical Clinic
140 Oxford Street East
Suite 300
London Ontario N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-850-3234
Fax: 519-850-3238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Apr 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Pantazis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pantazis (CPSO#: 110983 )
Business Address: 140 Oxford Street East
Suite 300
London Ontario N6A 5R9
(519) 850-3234

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Apr 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 19 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Theodoros Demetrius Pantazis may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Theodoros Demetrius Pantazis may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2016