THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:42:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-140 Oxford St E
London ON N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-850-3234
Fax: 519-850-3238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: IMAD EL SADEK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. El Sadek (CPSO#: 111734 )
Business Address: 3275 Jinnies Way
London ON N6L 0C3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-140 Oxford St E
London ON N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-850-3234
Fax: 519-850-3238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: IMAD EL SADEK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. El Sadek (CPSO#: 111734 )
Business Address: 3275 Jinnies Way
London ON N6L 0C3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IMAD HASSAN EL SADEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL SADEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IMAD HASSAN EL SADEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL SADEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017