THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:32:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: CHICAGO COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 140 Oxford Street East
Suite 300
London Ontario N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 850-3234
Fax: (519) 8503238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Mar 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: CHICAGO COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 140 Oxford Street East
Suite 300
London Ontario N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 850-3234
Fax: (519) 8503238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Mar 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Oct 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 17 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Alecia Beth Clary may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Alecia Beth Clary may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: CHICAGO COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Oct 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2018