THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 09:21:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street Victory 3-354A
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3351
Fax: (613) 548-2390

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 10 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Borschneck Yach Bardana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yach (CPSO#: 66809 ) Dr. D. Bardana (CPSO#: 68252 ) Dr. D. Borschneck (CPSO#: 64068 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
Room 3-3-119
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666

Corporation Name: Daniel Borschneck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Borschneck (CPSO#: 64068 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: 265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street Victory 3
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 3351

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street Victory 3-354A
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3351
Fax: (613) 548-2390

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 10 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Borschneck Yach Bardana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yach (CPSO#: 66809 ) Dr. D. Bardana (CPSO#: 68252 ) Dr. D. Borschneck (CPSO#: 64068 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
Room 3-3-119
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666

Corporation Name: Daniel Borschneck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Borschneck (CPSO#: 64068 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: 265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400
Business Address: 76 Stuart Street Victory 3
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 3351

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL PATRICK BORSCHNECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORSCHNECK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL PATRICK BORSCHNECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORSCHNECK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 22 Feb 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 22 Feb 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Nov 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1997

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 1996
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991