THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:32:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
76 Stuart Street, Watkins 3
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 6333
Fax: (613) 548-1336

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Borschneck Yach Bardana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yach (CPSO#: 66809 ) Dr. D. Bardana (CPSO#: 68252 ) Dr. D. Borschneck (CPSO#: 64068 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
Room 3-3-119
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666

Corporation Name: davide bardana medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Dec 2024

Corporation Name: Davide Bardana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
76 Stuart Street, Watkins 3
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 6333
Fax: (613) 548-1336

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Borschneck Yach Bardana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yach (CPSO#: 66809 ) Dr. D. Bardana (CPSO#: 68252 ) Dr. D. Borschneck (CPSO#: 64068 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
Room 3-3-119
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666

Corporation Name: davide bardana medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Dec 2024

Corporation Name: Davide Bardana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVIDE DOMENICO BARDANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARDANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVIDE DOMENICO BARDANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARDANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994