THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 10:31:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Watkins 3-104
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3961
Fax: (613) 548-1306
Address: 800 John Marks Ave
Kingston Ontario K7K 0J7
Phone: (613) 507-7246
Fax: (613) 344-1203

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Borschneck Yach Bardana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yach (CPSO#: 66809 ) Dr. D. Bardana (CPSO#: 68252 ) Dr. D. Borschneck (CPSO#: 64068 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
Room 3-3-119
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Yach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yach (CPSO#: 66809 )
Business Address: 800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7K 0J7
(613) 507-7246
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Nickle 3-305
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 3961

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Watkins 3-104
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3961
Fax: (613) 548-1306
Address: 800 John Marks Ave
Kingston Ontario K7K 0J7
Phone: (613) 507-7246
Fax: (613) 344-1203

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Borschneck Yach Bardana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yach (CPSO#: 66809 ) Dr. D. Bardana (CPSO#: 68252 ) Dr. D. Borschneck (CPSO#: 64068 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
Room 3-3-119
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Yach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yach (CPSO#: 66809 )
Business Address: 800 John Marks Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7K 0J7
(613) 507-7246
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Nickle 3-305
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 3961

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY DAVID YACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YACH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY DAVID YACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YACH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993