THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 09:54:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Calcutta National Medical College, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 247
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 595-1586
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: 905 494 2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suman Chatterjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 81386 ) Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 66284 ) Dr. A. Gupta (CPSO#: 84426 )

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Chatterjee, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 81386 ) Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 66284 )
Business Address: 247 - 2130 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
(905) 595-1586

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: Calcutta National Medical College, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 247
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 595-1586
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: 905 494 2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suman Chatterjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 81386 ) Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 66284 ) Dr. A. Gupta (CPSO#: 84426 )

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Chatterjee, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 81386 ) Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 66284 )
Business Address: 247 - 2130 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
(905) 595-1586

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUKHAMAY CHATTERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATTERJEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUKHAMAY CHATTERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATTERJEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Calcutta National Medical College, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1993
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 1993