THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 09:25:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 247
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 595-1586
Fax: (905) 595-0446

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anjalee Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 81386 ) Dr. A. Gupta (CPSO#: 84426 )

Corporation Name: Suman Chatterjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 81386 ) Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 66284 ) Dr. A. Gupta (CPSO#: 84426 )

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Chatterjee, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 81386 ) Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 66284 )
Business Address: 247 - 2130 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
(905) 595-1586

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 247
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 595-1586
Fax: (905) 595-0446

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anjalee Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 81386 ) Dr. A. Gupta (CPSO#: 84426 )

Corporation Name: Suman Chatterjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 81386 ) Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 66284 ) Dr. A. Gupta (CPSO#: 84426 )

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Chatterjee, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 81386 ) Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 66284 )
Business Address: 247 - 2130 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
(905) 595-1586

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMAN CHATTERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATTERJEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMAN CHATTERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATTERJEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004