THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:54:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Market Square
2130 North Park Drive
Unit 247
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 595-1587
Fax: 855-680-6800

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anjalee Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 81386 ) Dr. A. Gupta (CPSO#: 84426 )

Corporation Name: Suman Chatterjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 81386 ) Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 66284 ) Dr. A. Gupta (CPSO#: 84426 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Market Square
2130 North Park Drive
Unit 247
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 595-1587
Fax: 855-680-6800

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anjalee Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 81386 ) Dr. A. Gupta (CPSO#: 84426 )

Corporation Name: Suman Chatterjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 81386 ) Dr. S. Chatterjee (CPSO#: 66284 ) Dr. A. Gupta (CPSO#: 84426 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANJALEE SHILPA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANJALEE SHILPA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006